AL HB30 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Use tax, revenue redistributed to State General Fund, Sec. 40-23-85 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use tax, revenue redistributed to State General Fund, Sec. 40-23-85 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - Poole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2015-09-16HouseConference Committee on HB30 2015SS first Substitute Offered
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-539.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-15HouseEnrolled
2015-09-15HouseConcurred in Conference Report
2015-09-15SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 47
2015-09-15SenateConference Report Concurrence Requested
2015-09-15HousePringle and Warren intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-15HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 50
2015-09-15HouseConference Report
2015-09-14HouseConference Committee Appointed
2015-09-14SenateMarsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 33 P&PO appoints Orr, Pittman and Marsh P&PO appoints Orr, Pittman and Marsh
2015-09-14SenateConference Committee Requested
2015-09-14HousePoole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 44 House appoints Poole, Scott and Tuggle
2015-09-14HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-09-14SenateOrr to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-14SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 26
2015-09-14SenatePetition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 25
2015-09-14SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 24
2015-09-14SenateMarsh first Substitute Offered
2015-09-14SenateThird Reading Adopted
2015-09-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-10HouseEngrossed
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 19
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 18
2015-09-10HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB30
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015SS/PrintFiles/HB30-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530712&VOTE=18&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530713&VOTE=19&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531386&VOTE=24&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531387&VOTE=25&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531388&VOTE=26&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531397&VOTE=44&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531428&VOTE=33&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531654&VOTE=50&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531743&VOTE=47&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback