AL HB30 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighters, law enforcement officers, families eligible to receive death benefit as if the person died in the line of duty, resubmission of denied applications and extension of statute of limitations, Sec. 36-30-2 am'd.
Title
Firefighters, law enforcement officers, families eligible to receive death benefit as if the person died in the line of duty, resubmission of denied applications and extension of statute of limitations, Sec. 36-30-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-257. |
2015-05-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1013 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-14 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 366 |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 365 |
2015-04-14 | House | Treadaway Amendment Offered |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |