AL HB30 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - McClendon motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - McClendon motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Department, prison industries, sale of products further provided for, operation of joint venture with private businesses, authorized, Secs. 14-7-7, 14-7-22 am'd.
Title
Corrections Department, prison industries, sale of products further provided for, operation of joint venture with private businesses, authorized, Secs. 14-7-7, 14-7-22 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 24 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - McClendon motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | McClendon motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-03 | McClendon motion to Substitute SB63 for HB30 adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-03 | Holmes motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 563 | |
2012-04-03 | McClendon motion to Table adopted Roll Call 562 | |
2012-04-03 | Boman Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-03 | Holmes motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Voice Vote | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 561 | |
2012-04-03 | State Government Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Adopt offered | |
2012-03-15 | State Government Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |