AL HB30 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, overseas absentee voting, Electronic Overseas Voting Advisory Committee, established to advise whether secure electronic means of voting available, duties of absentee election manager, overseas voter certificate required, Secretary of State to implement rules
Title
Elections, overseas absentee voting, Electronic Overseas Voting Advisory Committee, established to advise whether secure electronic means of voting available, duties of absentee election manager, overseas voter certificate required, Secretary of State to implement rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 43 | |
2010-01-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution and Elections |