AL HB3 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 4:53 p.m. on March 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Delivered to Governor at 4:53 p.m. on March 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency management, emergency management personnel carrying out emergency functions relating to disasters further defined as public safety services, Sec. 31-9-3 am'd.
Title
Emergency management, emergency management personnel carrying out emergency functions relating to disasters further defined as public safety services, Sec. 31-9-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 567 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 566 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 126 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 125 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 566 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 126 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 125 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:53 p.m. on March 15, 2022. |
2022-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-187. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-15 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 567 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126 |
2022-02-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |