AL HB298 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor fuel taxes, single point of filing and payment system, Rev. Dept. to administer, taxes and exemptions standardized, Local Motor Fuel Tax Advisory Committee estab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor fuel taxes, single point of filing and payment system, Rev. Dept. to administer, taxes and exemptions standardized, Local Motor Fuel Tax Advisory Committee estab.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - Lee motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseForwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
2018-03-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-469.
2018-03-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-22HouseLee motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007
2018-03-22HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 995
2018-03-21SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 994
2018-03-21SenateTransportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-02-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 473
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar as Favorable
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB298&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB298-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB298-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590420&VOTE=473&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599236&VOTE=994&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599237&VOTE=995&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599861&VOTE=1007&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback