AL HB297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 12:14 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 12:14 p.m. on March 12, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jasper, raise number of seats on the Civil Service Board from three to five, and to provide that each city council district is represented by one seat, Act No. 113, 1965 First Sp. Sess., am'd.
Title
Jasper, raise number of seats on the Civil Service Board from three to five, and to provide that each city council district is represented by one seat, Act No. 113, 1965 First Sp. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 12, 2020 at 12:14 p.m. on March 12, 2020. |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-76. |
2020-03-12 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 365 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 200 |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |