AL HB293 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Ahead Act. commencing with 2013-2014 school year, revised to delete pen-enabled requirement, phase-in requirement and reassignment provisions, advisory committee revised, schools given question of participating, local school systems to contribute 25 percent of funding, Secs. 16-16B-1, 16-16B-2 am'd.
Title
Alabama Ahead Act. commencing with 2013-2014 school year, revised to delete pen-enabled requirement, phase-in requirement and reassignment provisions, advisory committee revised, schools given question of participating, local school systems to contribute 25 percent of funding, Secs. 16-16B-1, 16-16B-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Education |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2013-05-02 | House | Engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2013-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1066 |
2013-05-02 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1065 |
2013-05-02 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2013-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |