AL HB293 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Title
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D] | Rep. Gregory Canfield [R] | Rep. John Knight [D] | Rep. Jay Love [R] |
Rep. Demetrius Newton [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-506. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1035 | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 848 | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations |