AL HB292 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to exemptions from ad valorem taxation; to amend Section 40-9-1, as last amended by Act 2022-199 of the 2022 Regular Session, Code of Alabama 1975; to exempt certain aircraft from ad valorem taxation.
Title
Relating to exemptions from ad valorem taxation; to amend Section 40-9-1, as last amended by Act 2022-199 of the 2022 Regular Session, Code of Alabama 1975; to exempt certain aircraft from ad valorem taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sells [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Adopt WFZC9E-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Adopt WFZC9E-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2023-05-25 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-24 | House | Adopt WFZC9E-1 |
2023-05-24 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-27 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund WFZC9E-1 |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund 916ZPP-1 |
2023-04-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-04-11 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |