AL HB292 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency responders, Alabama Fire College authorized to provide certification to peer support members, Sec. 36-21-14 am'd.
Title
Emergency responders, Alabama Fire College authorized to provide certification to peer support members, Sec. 36-21-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 194 |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |