AL HB292 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Driver's licenses and similar cards, applicant for new or renewal, inclusion of documentation of deafness in records of Alabama State Law Enforcement Agency
Title
Driver's licenses and similar cards, applicant for new or renewal, inclusion of documentation of deafness in records of Alabama State Law Enforcement Agency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-365. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1147 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2017-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-04 | House | Members intended to cosponsor Roll Call 397 |
2017-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396 |
2017-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 395 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |