AL HB292 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1268
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1268
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste, application process for permits, local governing body approval, deemed denied if not approved within certain number of days, Sec. 22-27-48 am'd.
Title
Solid waste, application process for permits, local governing body approval, deemed denied if not approved within certain number of days, Sec. 22-27-48 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. Dickie Drake [R] |
Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Richard Baughn [R] |
Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] | Rep. Thomas Jackson [D] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. John Merrill [R] |
Rep. Alan Harper [R] | Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] | Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] |
Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1268 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1267 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Keahey motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 611 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 610 |
2014-03-05 | House | C&MG Amendment 3rd Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 609 |
2014-03-05 | House | C&MG Amendment 2nd Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 608 |
2014-03-05 | House | C&MG Amendment #1 Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 607 |
2014-03-05 | House | County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 3 amendments |
2014-01-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |