AL HB291 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Podiatry, scope of practice expanded to include foot and ankle, Sec. 34-24-230 am'd.
Title
Podiatry, scope of practice expanded to include foot and ankle, Sec. 34-24-230 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-22 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Health with 1 amendment |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
Same As/Similar To
SB371 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare