AL HB291 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Education Policy first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education, St. Board of Ed. to adopt policy, local boards of education authorized to allow released time for religious education off campus for elective credit, Alabama Released Time Credit Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, St. Board of Ed. to adopt policy, local boards of education authorized to allow released time for religious education off campus for elective credit, Alabama Released Time Credit Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseEducation Policy first Amendment Offered
2019-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
2019-05-22HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-281.
2019-05-22HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-22SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled
2019-05-21HousePassed Second House
2019-05-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 955
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2019-05-02HouseEngrossed
2019-05-02HouseHall intended to vote "Nay"
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 465
2019-05-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 464
2019-05-02HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2019-05-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-04-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB291&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB291-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB291-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB291-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199848-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614888&VOTE=464&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614961&VOTE=465&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621218&VOTE=955&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback