AL HB290 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Assigned Act No. 2010-553.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Assigned Act No. 2010-553.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments
Title
General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-553. | |
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 965 | |
2010-04-13 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1033 | |
2010-04-13 | Bedford motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Beason Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Bedford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1032 | |
2010-04-13 | Dixon Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Bedford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1031 | |
2010-04-13 | Dixon Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Bedford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1030 | |
2010-04-13 | Dixon Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1029 | |
2010-04-13 | Bedford first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 846 | |
2010-04-06 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 845 | |
2010-04-06 | Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations |