AL HB29 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Driver's licenses issued to persons under age 18, restrictions, penalties for violations of Stage II driver's licenses, revised, Deputy Hart Act, Sec. 32-6-7.2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses issued to persons under age 18, restrictions, penalties for violations of Stage II driver's licenses, revised, Deputy Hart Act, Sec. 32-6-7.2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - House - Holmes (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:26 a.m. on May 17, 2017.
2017-05-17HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-358.
2017-05-17HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-16SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-16HouseEnrolled
2017-05-16SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-16HouseHolmes (M) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 906
2017-05-16HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 905
2017-05-16HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-04-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 735
2017-04-27SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 734
2017-04-27SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2017-04-04HouseEngrossed
2017-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 375
2017-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 374
2017-04-04HouseHolmes (M) Amendment Offered
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-07HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2017-03-07HouseHolmes (M) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 174
2017-03-07HouseHolmes (M) Amendment Offered
2017-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB29&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB29-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB29-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=562412&VOTE=174&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=566309&VOTE=374&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=566316&VOTE=375&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571922&VOTE=734&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571923&VOTE=735&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576889&VOTE=905&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576891&VOTE=906&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback