AL HB286 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals, private hospital assessment and Medicaid funding program extended for fiscal year 2025, Secs. 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.
Title
Hospitals, private hospital assessment and Medicaid funding program extended for fiscal year 2025, Secs. 40-26B-71, 40-26B-73, 40-26B-77.1, 40-26B-79, 40-26B-80, 40-26B-81, 40-26B-82, 40-26B-84, 40-26B-88 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 468 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 467 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 267 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 266 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 265 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 467 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 267 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 266 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 265 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-127. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 468 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 267 |
2022-02-17 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 266 |
2022-02-17 | House | Clouse Amendment Offered |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 26B | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 77.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 26B | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |