AL HB286 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco products, sale, use, possession and transportation by a minor prohibited, notification to parent, Secs. 28-11-2, 28-11-13 am'd.
Title
Tobacco products, sale, use, possession and transportation by a minor prohibited, notification to parent, Secs. 28-11-2, 28-11-13 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-383. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | House | Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1257 |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1148 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1147 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 313 |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 312 |
2013-04-04 | House | Judiciary Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 311 |
2013-04-04 | House | Judiciary Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |