AL HB285 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing facilities, privilege assessments and surcharge on each nursing home bed, assessment extended, to August 31, 2025, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.
Title
Nursing facilities, privilege assessments and surcharge on each nursing home bed, assessment extended, to August 31, 2025, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 466 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 465 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 264 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 263 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 465 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 264 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 263 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:25 a.m. on March 3, 2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-126. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 466 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 264 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |