AL HB285 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Elections, electronic voting machines, curb side voting, operation of voting machines prohibited except on the inside of buildings designated as voting places, taking of ballots into or out of voting places prohibited, Sec.17-6-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, electronic voting machines, curb side voting, operation of voting machines prohibited except on the inside of buildings designated as voting places, taking of ballots into or out of voting places prohibited, Sec.17-6-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 1135 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 496 (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 495 (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 494 (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 493 (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateFurther Consideration
2021-04-22SenateRoberts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-04-22SenateRoberts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-04-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2021-03-18HouseEngrossed
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 496
2021-03-18HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 495
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 494
2021-03-18HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1764Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB285&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB285-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB285-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210673-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209768-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210052-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210323-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42042.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42151.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42566.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42792.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41773.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653302&VOTE=493&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB285&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653304&VOTE=494&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653308&VOTE=495&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653309&VOTE=496&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=660516&VOTE=1135&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB285&SESS=1077

Bill Comments 750

feedback