AL HB285 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local board of education, posting of personnel vacancies, time decreased when school is in session, Sec. 16-22-15 am'd.
Title
Local board of education, posting of personnel vacancies, time decreased when school is in session, Sec. 16-22-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Education |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 850 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 873 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 872 |
2013-04-25 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |