AL HB284 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses, female genital mutilation of female minor, crime created, penalties
Title
Crimes and offenses, female genital mutilation of female minor, crime created, penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 866 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 865 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 864 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 863 |
2018-03-15 | House | JUDY 3rd Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2018-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |