AL HB284 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 9:35 a.m. on May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health benefit plans, autism, coverage of autism spectrum disorder under certain conditions, Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 27-21A-23, 27-54A-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health benefit plans, autism, coverage of autism spectrum disorder under certain conditions, Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 27-21A-23, 27-54A-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Patterson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:35 a.m. on May 18, 2017.
2017-05-18HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-337.
2017-05-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-18SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-18SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-18HouseWeaver filed a Conflict of Interest Declaration
2017-05-18HouseEnrolled
2017-05-18HousePatterson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 980
2017-05-18HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097
2017-05-16SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1096
2017-05-16SenatePittman Amendment Offered
2017-05-16SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1095
2017-05-16SenateWard first Substitute Offered
2017-05-16SenatePittman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1094
2017-05-16SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1093
2017-05-16SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2017-05-16SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2017-04-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2017-04-20HouseEngrossed
2017-04-20HousePringle Conflict of Interest Declaration Filed
2017-04-20HouseCosponsors Added
2017-04-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 558
2017-04-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 557
2017-04-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 556
2017-04-20HouseINS 2nd Amendment Offered
2017-04-20HouseINS 1st Amendment Offered
2017-04-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2017-02-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB284&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB284-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB284-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185117-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185175-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570143&VOTE=556&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570172&VOTE=557&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570175&VOTE=558&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570176&VOTE=559&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576840&VOTE=1093&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576841&VOTE=1094&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576845&VOTE=1095&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576849&VOTE=1096&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576850&VOTE=1097&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578387&VOTE=980&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback