AL HB284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Polygraph Examiners, applicants required to provide results of state and national criminal history background checks and two sets of fingerprints, Sec. 34-25-22 am'd
Title
Polygraph Examiners, applicants required to provide results of state and national criminal history background checks and two sets of fingerprints, Sec. 34-25-22 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Allen Farley [R] |
Rep. Dan Williams [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Mac Buttram [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] |
Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Mike Hill [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 272 |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |