AL HB283 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to state income tax credits for rural physicians; to designate Sections 40-18-130, 40-18-131, and 40-18-132, Code of Alabama 1975, as Division 1 of Article 4A of Chapter 18 of Title 40, Code of Alabama 1975; to terminate the income tax credit authorized for a rural physician under the existing Article 4A of Chapter 18, Title 40, Code of Alabama 1975, effective December 31, 2023; to provide that any physician who claimed the credit or claims the credit under the existing Article 4A for the tax year ending on December 31, 2023, would be authorized to continue to claim the credit under the prior law until the credit period authorized under the prior law for that physician expires; to add Division 2 to Article 4A of Chapter 18, Title 40, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for a rural physician income tax credit; to provide definitions; to modify the requirement for residence and practice in a rural community; to remove the requirement for hospital privileges in a rural community; and to require the State Board of Medical Examiners to certify physicians who qualify for the income tax credit.
Title
Relating to state income tax credits for rural physicians; to designate Sections 40-18-130, 40-18-131, and 40-18-132, Code of Alabama 1975, as Division 1 of Article 4A of Chapter 18 of Title 40, Code of Alabama 1975; to terminate the income tax credit authorized for a rural physician under the existing Article 4A of Chapter 18, Title 40, Code of Alabama 1975, effective December 31, 2023; to provide that any physician who claimed the credit or claims the credit under the existing Article 4A for the tax year ending on December 31, 2023, would be authorized to continue to claim the credit under the prior law until the credit period authorized under the prior law for that physician expires; to add Division 2 to Article 4A of Chapter 18, Title 40, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for a rural physician income tax credit; to provide definitions; to modify the requirement for residence and practice in a rural community; to remove the requirement for hospital privileges in a rural community; and to require the State Board of Medical Examiners to certify physicians who qualify for the income tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-11 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |