AL HB283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales and use taxes, state, county, and municipal, School of Fine Arts Foundation, Incorporated, High School of Mathematics and Science Foundation, School of Cyber Technology and Engineering Foundation, exempt
Title
Taxation, sales and use taxes, state, county, and municipal, School of Fine Arts Foundation, Incorporated, High School of Mathematics and Science Foundation, School of Cyber Technology and Engineering Foundation, exempt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-24 | House | Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB40 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Assigned Act No. 2021-130.