AL HB283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner's insurance, endorsement required for new policies or renewals upgrading home to fortified standard when roof damage requires roof to be replaced, Sec. 27-31D-4 added.
Title
Homeowner's insurance, endorsement required for new policies or renewals upgrading home to fortified standard when roof damage requires roof to be replaced, Sec. 27-31D-4 added.
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:01 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-240. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 792 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 316 |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 315 |
2019-04-23 | House | Insurance Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |