AL HB282 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on February 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on February 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Shelby Co., civil service system, exempt employees further provided for in Judge of Probate and Property Tax Commissioner offices, Act 93-664, 1993 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Shelby Co., civil service system, exempt employees further provided for in Judge of Probate and Property Tax Commissioner offices, Act 93-664, 1993 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 325 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 324 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 110 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - HBIR: Ellis motion to Adopt Roll Call 109 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 324 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 110 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - HBIR: Ellis motion to Adopt Roll Call 109 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on February 17, 2022. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-52. |
2022-02-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 325 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Shelby County Legislation |
2022-02-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 110 |
2022-02-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation |