AL HB282 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bail, in criminal cases, Section 16, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, am'd, const. amend.
Title
Bail, in criminal cases, Section 16, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, am'd, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Wadsworth motion to Carry Over (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Wadsworth motion to Carry Over (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-21 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 837 |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 836 |
2019-05-21 | House | England Amendment Offered |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 835 |
2019-05-21 | House | Wadsworth Amendment Offered |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 834 |
2019-05-21 | House | Wadsworth motion to Carry Over lost Roll Call 833 |
2019-05-21 | House | Judiciary Substitute Offered |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |