AL HB282 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 1:41 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Muscle Shoals, ad valorem tax, city council authorized to increase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Muscle Shoals, ad valorem tax, city council authorized to increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor at 1:41 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
2018-03-08HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-241.
2018-03-08HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-08SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HousePassed Second House
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 684
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-02-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 186
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB282&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB282-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585822&VOTE=186&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593853&VOTE=684&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592661&VOTE=608&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592663&VOTE=609&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593017&VOTE=610&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback