AL HB282 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 9:35 a.m. on May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Voter registration, convicted felons, moral turpitude defined for purposes of crimes which disqualify persons from voting, Felony Voter Disqualification Act, Sec. 17-3-30.1 added; Secs. 17-4-3, 17-4-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration, convicted felons, moral turpitude defined for purposes of crimes which disqualify persons from voting, Felony Voter Disqualification Act, Sec. 17-3-30.1 added; Secs. 17-4-3, 17-4-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:35 a.m. on May 18, 2017.
2017-05-18HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-378.
2017-05-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-18SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-18HouseEnrolled
2017-05-17HousePassed Second House
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1254
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2017-03-09HouseEngrossed
2017-03-09HouseKnight Dissent filed
2017-03-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 191
2017-03-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 190
2017-03-09HouseJones Amendment Offered
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback