AL HB281 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, supplemental appropriation for fiscal year ending September 30, 2010, to Walker County School System for Oakman Elementary School and to Lee County School System for Wacoochee Junior High School

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, supplemental appropriation for fiscal year ending September 30, 2010, to Walker County School System for Oakman Elementary School and to Lee County School System for Wacoochee Junior High School

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-696 on 04/29/2010.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-21 Enrolled
2010-04-21 Passed Second House
2010-04-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1151
2010-04-21 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-25 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2010-02-18 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 341
2010-02-18 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-11 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-01-14 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback