AL HB280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public K-12 education, fentanyl prevention and drug poisoning awareness required in grades 6 through 12.
Title
Public K-12 education, fentanyl prevention and drug poisoning awareness required in grades 6 through 12.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 339 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 339 |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-05 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |