AL HB280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 9:49 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 9:49 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, school zones, reduced speed zones, includes in double fines, Secs. 32-5A-181, 32-5A-182, 32-5A-183 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, school zones, reduced speed zones, includes in double fines, Secs. 32-5A-181, 32-5A-182, 32-5A-183 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1078 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1077 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 357 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 356 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1077 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 357 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 356 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:49 a.m. on April 22, 2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-305. |
2021-04-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 357 |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 5A | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |