AL HB28 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public contracts, Alabama Fire College, joint purchasing agreement, authorized, competitive bids, Sec. 41-16-50 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts, Alabama Fire College, joint purchasing agreement, authorized, competitive bids, Sec. 41-16-50 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateFurther Consideration
2018-02-15SenateScofield motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-01-30SenateReported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2018-01-25HouseHurst intended to vote "Yea"
2018-01-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 100
2018-01-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback