AL HB28 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-15 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, levy of index gasoline tax and index diesel tax, authorized, Secs. 40-17-370 to 40-17-373, inclusive, added; Sec. 40-17-325 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, levy of index gasoline tax and index diesel tax, authorized, Secs. 40-17-370 to 40-17-373, inclusive, added; Sec. 40-17-325 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15HouseFurther Consideration
2015-09-15HouseMcCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-14HouseMcCutcheon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-14HouseTransportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Substitute Offered
2015-09-14HousePending third reading on day 4 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure with 1 substitute
2015-09-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback