AL HB279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, aviation jet fuel purchased by international cargo air carriers, refund for excise tax paid on purchases of aviation jet fuel by exemption from sales and use tax, Secs. 40-17-329, 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.
Title
Taxation, aviation jet fuel purchased by international cargo air carriers, refund for excise tax paid on purchases of aviation jet fuel by exemption from sales and use tax, Secs. 40-17-329, 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] |
Rep. Laura Hall [D] | Rep. Jim Carns [R] | Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Greg Burdine [D] |
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Todd Greeson [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Micky Hammon [R] |
Rep. John Robinson [D] | Rep. Johnny Morrow [D] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Mac Buttram [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] | Rep. Marcel Black [D] |
Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Wes Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-200. |
2013-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 832 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed |
2013-03-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 200 |
2013-03-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 199 |
2013-03-12 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |