AL HB278 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-17)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-17)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secondary metals recycler, additional records to be maintained, purchases of specified metal property limited, registration with ACJIC, required, database of metal property sales created, criminal penalties, purchase of specified metal property prohibited, Secs. 13A-8-30 to 13A-8-37, inclusive, 13A-8-39 am'd; Secs. 13A-8-31.1, 13A-8-31.2, 13A-8-35.1, 13A-8-37.1, 13A-8-37.2 added
Title
Secondary metals recycler, additional records to be maintained, purchases of specified metal property limited, registration with ACJIC, required, database of metal property sales created, criminal penalties, purchase of specified metal property prohibited, Secs. 13A-8-30 to 13A-8-37, inclusive, 13A-8-39 am'd; Secs. 13A-8-31.1, 13A-8-31.2, 13A-8-35.1, 13A-8-37.1, 13A-8-37.2 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Poole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 78) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Oden motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 34 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Judy 3rd amendment (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Poole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 78) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Oden motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 70 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 34 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Judy 3rd amendment (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Committee on HB278 2012RS first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-426. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certificate | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1384 | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1519 | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Report | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-05-09 | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1270 P&PO appoints Brooks, Smitherman and Ward | |
2012-05-09 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Poole motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1360 House appoints Poole, Wood and Robinson (O) | |
2012-05-08 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1139 | |
2012-05-08 | Brooks motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1138 | |
2012-05-08 | Brooks Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Brooks motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1137 | |
2012-05-08 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-01 | Sessions intended to vote Yea | |
2012-03-01 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 206 | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 205 | |
2012-03-01 | Rogers Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Oden motion to Table adopted Roll Call 204 | |
2012-03-01 | Beckman Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 203 | |
2012-03-01 | Boothe Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 202 | |
2012-03-01 | Jones 4th Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 201 | |
2012-03-01 | Jones 3rd Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 200 | |
2012-03-01 | Jones 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 199 | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table lost Roll Call 198 | |
2012-03-01 | Jones 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 196 | |
2012-03-01 | Judiciary 6th Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 195 | |
2012-03-01 | Judiciary 5th Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 194 | |
2012-03-01 | Judiciary 4th Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt Judy 3rd amendment adopted Roll Call 193 | |
2012-03-01 | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 192 | |
2012-03-01 | Newton (C) Substitute Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Judiciary 3rd.Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 191 | |
2012-03-01 | JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 190 | |
2012-03-01 | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 6 amendments | |
2012-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |