AL HB277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:01 p.m. on April 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:01 p.m. on April 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lauderdale Co., sheriff, authorize fees for certain administrative services, distrib. of revenues
Title
Lauderdale Co., sheriff, authorize fees for certain administrative services, distrib. of revenues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 741 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 740 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 64 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - HBIR: Pettus motion to Adopt Roll Call 63 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 740 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 64 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - HBIR: Pettus motion to Adopt Roll Call 63 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 5:01 p.m. on April 6, 2021. |
2021-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-192. |
2021-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 741 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2021-02-10 | House | Sorrell intended to vote "Nay" |
2021-02-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 64 |
2021-02-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |