AL HB277 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child care facilities, church based, licensing required, Secs. 13A-6-29, 38-7-2, 38-7-3, 38-13-2, 38-13-3 am'd.
Title
Child care facilities, church based, licensing required, Secs. 13A-6-29, 38-7-2, 38-7-3, 38-13-2, 38-13-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1204 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1203 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 564 |
2017-04-20 | House | Nordgren intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-04-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 563 |
2017-04-20 | House | Warren first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy |