AL HB276 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 9:15 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 9:15 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Dental Examiners, powers and duties, rulemaking authority clarified, Sec. 34-9-43.2 added
Title
Board of Dental Examiners, powers and duties, rulemaking authority clarified, Sec. 34-9-43.2 added
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - Rowe motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:15 p.m. on May 3, 2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Health first Amendment Offered |
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-302. |
2016-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-05-03 | House | Rowe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 822 |
2016-05-03 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 912 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 911 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Bussman Amendment Offered |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-12 | House | Engrossed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 585 |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 584 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rowe Amendment Offered |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 583 |
2016-04-12 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |