AL HB276 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Community Action Association of Alabama, exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Action Association of Alabama, exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Coleman-Evans motion to Table (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-407.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1208
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2014-03-11HouseEngrossed
2014-03-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 713
2014-03-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 712
2014-03-11HouseColeman-Evans Amendment Offered
2014-03-11HouseColeman-Evans motion to Table adopted Roll Call 711
2014-03-11HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2014-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-26HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB276
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB276-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB276-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB276-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=492972&VOTE=711&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=492974&VOTE=712&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=492981&VOTE=713&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500534&VOTE=1208&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback