AL HB274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology and Barbering, Board of, mobile salons, licensure and regulation, Sec. 34-7B-30 added; Sec. 34-7B-1 am'd.
Title
Cosmetology and Barbering, Board of, mobile salons, licensure and regulation, Sec. 34-7B-30 added; Sec. 34-7B-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1265 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 1264 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 221 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Drummond motion to Adopt Roll Call 220 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 75) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 1264 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 221 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Drummond motion to Adopt Roll Call 220 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 75) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-406. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1265 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 221 |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 7B | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 7B | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |