AL HB272 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:05 p.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:05 p.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms, certain restrictions on carrying in motor vehicle, Local Government Pistol Permit Revenue Loss Fund, created, penalties, provided, Secs. 13A-11-55, 13A-11-73 repealed; Secs. 13A-11-7, 13A-11-50, 13A-11-61.2, 13A-11-62, 13A-11-71, 13A-11-74, 13A-11-85, 13A-11-90 am'd.
Title
Firearms, certain restrictions on carrying in motor vehicle, Local Government Pistol Permit Revenue Loss Fund, created, penalties, provided, Secs. 13A-11-55, 13A-11-73 repealed; Secs. 13A-11-7, 13A-11-50, 13A-11-61.2, 13A-11-62, 13A-11-71, 13A-11-74, 13A-11-85, 13A-11-90 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Stringer motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 577 (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 555 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reed motion to Accede Roll Call 537 P&PO appoints Allen, Barfoot and Singleton (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Stringer motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee Roll Call 507 House appoints Jones (M), Stringer and Howard (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 480 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 479 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous Roll Call 478 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Table Roll Call 477 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Table Roll Call 476 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 475 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 277 (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 276 (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 275 (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - HBIR: Stringer motion to Adopt Roll Call 274 (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 555 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reed motion to Accede Roll Call 537 P&PO appoints Allen, Barfoot and Singleton (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Stringer motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee Roll Call 507 House appoints Jones (M), Stringer and Howard (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 480 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 479 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous Roll Call 478 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Table Roll Call 477 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Scofield motion to Table Roll Call 476 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 475 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 277 (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 276 (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 275 (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - HBIR: Stringer motion to Adopt Roll Call 274 (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 3:05 p.m. on March 10, 2022. |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference Committee on HB272 2022RS first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-133. |
2022-03-10 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 555 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-10 | House | Stringer motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 577 |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference Report |
2022-03-10 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reed motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 537 P&PO appoints Allen, Barfoot and Singleton |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2022-03-09 | House | Stringer motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 507 House appoints Jones (M), Stringer and Howard |
2022-03-09 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 480 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 479 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 478 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Scofield first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Scofield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 477 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Scofield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 476 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 277 |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 276 |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security 2nd Amendment Offered |
2022-02-22 | House | Easterbrook intended vote "Yea" |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 275 |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security 1st Amendment Offered |
2022-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13A | 11 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 55 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 61.2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 73 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 11 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |