AL HB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prostitution, to allow disclosure of certain person's picture after being arrested, Sec. 13A-6-183 am'd.
Title
Prostitution, to allow disclosure of certain person's picture after being arrested, Sec. 13A-6-183 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 364 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 363 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 362 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Coleman motion to Adopt Roll Call 361 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 363 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 362 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Coleman motion to Adopt Roll Call 361 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364 |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 363 |
2021-03-11 | House | Coleman Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 362 |
2021-03-11 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |