AL HB271 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Morgan Co., Tennessee Valley Authority in-lieu-of tax payments; distrib. to certain school systems altered, additional payments to Calhoun Community College and Athens State University, 2011-267, 2011 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Morgan Co., Tennessee Valley Authority in-lieu-of tax payments; distrib. to certain school systems altered, additional payments to Calhoun Community College and Athens State University, 2011-267, 2011 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Micky Hammon [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-199. |
2013-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 834 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 72 |
2013-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |