AL HB27 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Baker motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools, public K-12 teachers and employees, charged with certain sexual crimes against students, paid administrative leave and discipline of school employees charged removed, Sec. 13A-6-83 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools, public K-12 teachers and employees, charged with certain sexual crimes against students, paid administrative leave and discipline of school employees charged removed, Sec. 13A-6-83 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Baker motion to Substitute SB28 for HB27 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseBaker motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-15HouseThird Reading Indefinitely Postponed
2018-02-15HouseBaker motion to Substitute SB28 for HB27
2018-01-25HouseBaker motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-25HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback