AL HB27 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Ballot Commission, ballot statement to be posted on website of Sec. of State in lieu of Legislative website, Sec. 17-6-81 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Ballot Commission, ballot statement to be posted on website of Sec. of State in lieu of Legislative website, Sec. 17-6-81 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-337.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-03HousePassed Second House
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 925
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03SenateReed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2016-02-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39
2016-02-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback