AL HB27 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-15 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minimum wages, political subdivisions of state prohibited from establishing above amount set by federal law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wages, political subdivisions of state prohibited from establishing above amount set by federal law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-15HouseFurther Consideration
2015-09-15HouseFaulkner motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-14HouseFaulkner motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-14HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-09-14HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback